Accounts and annual returns COTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1134860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 31 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 12 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 28 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 18 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 29 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 29 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window