COTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To run the village hall in Coton and to raise funds to refurbish the building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 11 March 2010: Standard registration
- 18 May 2011: Funds received from 1097934 THE COTON VILLAGE HALL FUND
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Clare Elizabeth Fox | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Anthony Radford | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Celia Mary Beadle | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Graham Burford | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAULA JANE HAIN | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Green | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ann Puntis | Trustee | 03 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Lawton | Trustee | 21 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY FORRESTER TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.88k | £14.82k | £24.53k | £23.40k | £34.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.64k | £9.59k | £14.14k | £19.78k | £29.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.74k | £500 | £2.40k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 MAY 2009 MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/05/2009
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES; AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
COTON VILLAGE HALL
56 HIGH STREET
COTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 7PL
- Phone:
- 07976612477
- Email:
- puntisa@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
cotonvillagehall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window