Trustees COTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1134860

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Clare Elizabeth Fox | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Anthony Radford | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Celia Mary Beadle | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Graham Burford | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAULA JANE HAIN | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Green | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ann Puntis | Trustee | 03 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Lawton | Trustee | 21 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY FORRESTER TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.