FAITH HOPE AND LOVE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the relief of poverty, sickness and distress, in particular orphans and widows the advancement of the christian faith and values occasional other charitable objectives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 July 2010: Standard registration
- 24 September 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 30/06/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £36.83k | £60.96k | £3.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.01k | £37.69k | £57.25k | £7.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 20 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 10 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 10 October 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 11 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 11 October 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 22 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 23 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR OF ORPHANS AND WIDOWS IN CHARITABLE NEED 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND VALUES 3 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window