DISABILITY CROYDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing services across the range of disabilities for people in the Croydon area . The service include Advocacy , Employment Services , Information and Advice and general support Disability Croydon provides bespoke Disability Awareness Training - Hidden Disability Awareness Training and Training on Equalities and Discrimination to Employers and employees in the Private and Public Sector
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £72,360 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christian Sinclair | Trustee | 12 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amie Cham | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Daughtrey | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
caite Ni Ceileachair | Trustee | 03 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SEDLEY WILSON | Trustee | 03 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Fatima Sanneh | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.03k | £49.01k | £116.37k | £110.88k | £102.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.61k | £52.39k | £107.63k | £115.20k | £105.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £50.00k | £47.37k | £96.68k | £102.74k | £72.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 06 JANUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES WITHIN CROYDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY; A ELIMINATING BARRIERS AND EMPOWERING INDIVIDUALS WITH DISABILITIES TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN SOCIETY WITHIN THE SOCIAL MODEL OF DISABILITY. B PROMOTING THE REALITIES OF SELF-REPRESENTATION AND INDEPENDENCE FOR PEOPLE LIVING WITH DISABILITIES. C ADVISING ORGANISATIONS OF EFFECTIVE CONSULTATION METHODS AND ACTIVE INVOLVEMENT OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES IN SERVICES AND DECISION-MAKING PROCESSES WHICH AFFECT THEIR LIVES. D INCREASING AWARENESS OF DISABILITY ISSUES AMONG NON-DISABLED PEOPLE AND ORGANISATIONS.
Area of benefit
CROYDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
50
HIGH STREET
CROYDON
CR0 1YB
- Phone:
- 074673 313 118
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window