CANDLE FOR INDIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Candle for India supports children with special needs including cerebral palsy in India. We provide funding for the treatment and schooling of children at the Deepti Centre in Adoor Kerala.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 23 July 2010: Standard registration
- CANDLE FOR INDIA (Previous name)
- CARING AND ADDRESSING THE NEEDS OF DIFFERENTLY ABLED LIVES THROUGH EDUCATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE CLAY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Anne Ng | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DIANA JANE BARCLAY | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARK EDWARD HUGH SPELLER CPFA | Trustee |
|
||||||
MATHEW VARGHEESE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.17k | £4.44k | £3.73k | £9.98k | £19.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.92k | £23.19k | £7.57k | £91 | £28.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 14 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
A THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN INDIA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT, TRAINING AND ADVICE, BOOKS, EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS AND OTHER FACILITIES TO PARTNER SCHOOLS, ESTABLISHING SCHOOLS FOR CHILDREN WITH CEREBRAL PALSY AND OTHER MOTOR DISORDERS, PROMOTING EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES B THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH FOR POORER COMMUNITIES IN INDIA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HEALTH EDUCATION, MEDICAL ADVICE, CARE AND ASSISTANCE ESPECIALLY FOR CHILDREN WITH CEREBRAL PALSY AND OTHER MOTOR DISORDERS C THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN INDIA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING, PROMOTION OF LITERACY, ASSISTANCE IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF SMALL ENTERPRISES AND REHABILITATION OF DIFFERENTLY-ABLED PERSONS D THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH IN INDIA THROUGH THE TRAINING FOR PASTORS AND MISSIONARIES, SUPPORTING OR FUNDING CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS, EVANGELISTIC OUT REACH, PROVISION OF CHURCH BUILDING AND RELATED FACILITIES AND THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF CHRISTIAN LITERATURE
Area of benefit
INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Ellam Avenue
DURHAM
DH1 4PG
- Phone:
- 07901987609
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window