Accounts and annual returns WELSH WARRIOR (THE RICHARD HUNTFOUNDATION)

Charity number: 1134637
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 March 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 10 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 11 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required