Financial history WELSH WARRIOR (THE RICHARD HUNTFOUNDATION)

Charity number: 1134637
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £29.12k £22.88k £14.72k £11.83k £3.49k
Total expenditure £33.23k £21.98k £3.87k £1.57k £2.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A