THE PATRICK EVANS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public, and to benefit the public in general, by promoting awareness and safety in sport and recreational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 19 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALUN IVOR EVANS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Hugo Evans | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
RORY EVANS | Trustee | 14 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR MATT LLOYD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MIKE DENNIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE JUDITH EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LOUISE EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.07k | £154 | £3.48k | £274 | £1.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.24k | £17.04k | £19.63k | £5.20k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 19 September 2024 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF PHYSICAL DISEASE OR ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION, AND IN PARTICULAR SUFFERERS OF PROSTATE CANCER OR DISEASES OF THE KIDNEY, AND THE FAMILIES OF SUCH SUFFERERS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. 2 TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS AND EMOTIONAL UPSET OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, COMFORT AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS. 3 TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN HEALTHY RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES THAT THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD. 4 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, AND TO BENEFIT THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, BY PROMOTING AWARENESS AND SAFETY IN SPORT AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 CRONKS HILL ROAD
REDHILL
RH1 6LY
- Phone:
- 01737249677
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window