THE NORTH EAST CIRCUS DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The NECDT, known as Circus Central, works to give people of all ages the chance to develop to their full potential through the exploration of physical & creative skills inherent in circus. We support individuals and communities by providing circus activities for people of all ages, abilities & back-grounds in order to support personal & professional development, and have fun!
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 March 2022
Total income includes £36,590 from 5 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- Redcar And Cleveland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 08 June 2010: Standard registration
- 24 April 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
- CIRCUS CENTRAL (Working name)
- NORTHEAST CIRCUS DEVELOPMENT TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/03/2018 | 28/03/2019 | 28/03/2020 | 28/03/2021 | 28/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.59k | £152.60k | £122.34k | £172.63k | £249.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.82k | £121.88k | £145.47k | £141.25k | £248.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £43.49k | £36.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 28 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 28 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 28 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 28 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 OCTOBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRACTICE AND UNDERSTANDING OF CIRCUS AND STREET ARTS (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: MUSIC, SONG, DANCE, MIME, ACROBATICS, JUGGLING, TRAPEZE, HIGH WIRE AND STREET PERFORMANCE) IN THE NORTHERN REGION AND SUCH OTHER PLACES AT THE DISCRETION OF THE BOARD BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (I) PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A BUILDING (KNOWN AS CIRCUS CENTRAL) USED FOR THE PRODUCTION, PRESENTATION, PARTICIPATION, ENJOYMENT AND UNDERSTANDING BY THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF CIRCUS AND STREET ARTS; (II) BRINGING TOGETHER, MAINTAINING AND PROMOTING THE WORK OF OTHER LIKE CIRCUSES AND STREET ART ORGANISATIONS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (III) PROVIDING AND PROMOTING EDUCATIONAL COURSES, PROGRAMMES AND ACTIVITIES ACROSS A BROAD RANGE OF CIRCUS AND STREET ARTS TECHNIQUES AND SKILLS; AND (IV) SEEKING TO ACHIEVE THE HIGHEST STANDARDS AND EXCELLENCE IN CIRCUS AND STREET ARTS SKILLS AND TECHNIQUES AND IN THE WORK OF THE COMPANY LOCALLY, REGIONALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY. THE NORTHERN REGION MEANS THE ADMINISTRATIVE AREAS OF THE BOROUGHS OF GATESHEAD, NORTH TYNESIDE, SOUTH TYNESIDE, HARTLEPOOL, MIDDLESBOROUGH, REDCAR AND EAST CLEVELAND, STOCKTON AND DARLINGTON; THE COUNTIES OF DURHAM AND NORTHUMBERLAND; AND THE CITIES OF SUNDERLAND AND NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE.
Area of benefit
NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window