MW (GK) FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1134916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To pursue the objects of the charity with all the resources available to the charity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Total income: £219,794
Total expenditure: £483,532

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 March 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • WEISZ CHILDREN FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GELLA BRAINA KLEIN Chair 02 August 2011
None on record
SHLOMO KLEIN Trustee 02 August 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £534.99k £267.73k £235.69k £440.53k £219.79k
Total expenditure £330.87k £339.71k £424.84k £413.23k £483.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £113.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £421.99k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £292.08k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £38.79k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £2.16k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £289.80k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £38.79k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 10 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 10 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 18 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 18 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 21 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 21 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 30 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 30 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 25 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 25 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 BRANTWOOD ROAD
SALFORD
M7 4EN
Phone:
01617922330
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available