INSTITUTE OF ISLAMIC BANKING AND INSURANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education, training development, research and publications aimed at providing awareness and knowledge of the concepts and moral practices in financial transactions governed by Islamic principles. The Institute of Islamic Banking and Insurance offers courses, organises training and publishes books on important areas of Islamic economics and finance, as well as a magazine, NewHorizon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Asefa Qayyum | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
FARIDA RAHMAN | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Ali Qayyum | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.90k | £71.94k | £65.83k | £147.84k | £56.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.55k | £64.28k | £68.69k | £78.67k | £87.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 20 OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED 28 SEPTEMBER 2009 CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME ISSUED 30 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: (A) TO DEVELOP, ORGANISE AND PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RESEARCH IN ISLAMIC FINANCE, BANKING AND INSURANCE AND RELATED FINANCIAL SYSTEMS (B) TO DEVELOP, ORGANISE AND CONDUCT EXAMINATIONS AND AWARD QUALIFICATIONS, CERTIFICATES, DIPLOMAS AND OTHER FORMS OF PROFESSIONAL ACCREDITATIONS (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE ON THE SUBJECT OF ISLAMIC FINANCE, BANKING AND INSURANCE AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE SUBJECT (D) TO ACT AS AN AUTHORITATIVE BODY FOR THE PURPOSE OF CONSULTATION AND RESEARCH IN MATTERS OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT, INDUSTRY PRACTICE OR PUBLIC INTEREST CONCERNING ISLAMIC FINANCE AND INSURANCE.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Viglen House Business Centre
Office # 120
Alperton Lane
WEMBLEY
Middlesex
HA0 1HD
- Phone:
- 02072450404
- Email:
- iibi@islamic-banking.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window