LONDON WEST AREA QUAKER MEETING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further the general religious and charitable purposes of the Religious Society of Friends (Quakers) within West London and beyond, primarily by holding Quaker public worship at its meeting houses and supporting the outreach and mission of the wider Society both financially and through the active involvement of its Members and Attenders in the Society's work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Westminster
- Ealing
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
- Hounslow
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Ann Dawson | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD LASSON | Trustee | 17 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Stephen Wright | Trustee | 17 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Scott Booth | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Margaret Bower | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.33k | £94.96k | £839.92k | £143.31k | £106.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.44k | £131.53k | £119.46k | £922.70k | £282.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £832.13k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £7.77k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £14 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £745.39k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £119.46k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 December 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 December 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MARCH 2009 as amended on 19 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE AREA MEETING IS THE FURTHERANCE OF THE GENERAL RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN IN THE AREA OF THE LONDON WEST MEETING AND BEYOND.
Area of benefit
LONDON WEST
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westminster Society Of Friends
8 Hop Gardens
LONDON
WC2N 4EH
- Phone:
- 07939262133
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window