COMMUNITY RECORDING STUDIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities are to offer a drop-in space for young people primarily between the ages of 13 ÔÇô 25 around music/dance, music technology, performance and design, where they can develop new or existing skills in and around these areas in a friendly environment, free of charge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 17 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Langley | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel James | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Moore | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|||||
JOANNE GILLIAN SPICK | Trustee | 15 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £247.09k | £371.17k | £222.24k | £208.73k | £105.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £231.18k | £249.11k | £284.13k | £231.55k | £145.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £26.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £44.20k | £31.88k | £26.36k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
= TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN NOTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF MUSIC AND RELATED ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE ADULTS.: = TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE, IN MUSIC AND THE ART AND SCIENCE OF STUDIO RECORDING
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
RUSSELL YOUTH CLUB
LOWDHAM STREET
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 2DP
- Phone:
- 07921845763
- Email:
- rachael.crs@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window