Trustees DUKE STREET CHURCH (RICHMOND-UPON-THAMES)
Charity Number: 1134492

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth McLeish | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laurie Hunter | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Borsley | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Dawn Vincent | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Chay Long | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Richard Pryor | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Bateman | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Stanley Baird | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Frederick Taylor | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul John CHAMBERS | Trustee | 22 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.