Accounts and annual returns LEADERS IN COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1137183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 April 2024 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 April 2024 63 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window