Financial history LEADERS IN COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1137183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £215.87k £335.44k £455.71k £368.81k £391.09k
Total expenditure £210.76k £243.59k £343.96k £338.37k £354.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £38.46k £30.59k £49.72k £21.01k £8.33k