Accounts and annual returns THE CRESCENT SUPPORT GROUP LIMITED

Charity number: 1134681
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 February 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 July 2020 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required