THE SHADHDHULIYYA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the religion of Islam in particular the teachings and practices of the Shadhdhuliyya Path, the Path of Unity, Peace, Mercy and Justice. To relieve those in financial need, hardship or distress in particulary but not exclusively through education. The trust will operate in the Palestinian Occupied Territories, in the UK and such other countries in the world as the trustees determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Morocco
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- United States
Governance
- 31 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zaynab Martin | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HENRY MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAURICE CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARILYN JANET SOBIEROJ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.73k | £15.85k | £14.87k | £20.71k | £4.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.06k | £23.70k | £14.51k | £9.91k | £8.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 JAN 2010 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 31 MAR 2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
3. APPLICATION OF INCOME THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC (¶THE OBJECTS÷) (A) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN PARTICULAR THE TEACHINGS AND PRACTICES OF THE SHADHDHULIYYA PATH, THE PATH OF UNITY, PEACE, MERCY AND JUSTICE BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME. (B) TO RELIEVE THOSE IN FINANCIAL NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH EDUCATION. THE TRUST WILL OPERATE IN THE PALESTINIAN OCCUPIED TERRITORIES, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SUCH OTHER COUNTRIES IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
PALESTINIAN OCCUPIED TERRITORIES, UK AND OTHER COUNTRIES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 12
High Acres
1 Old Park Road
ENFIELD
Middlesex
EN2 7DT
- Phone:
- 07888752263
- Email:
- shadhuligroupuk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window