Financial history RISBOROUGH AREA COMMUNITY BUS

Charity number: 1136169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £42.05k £36.80k £37.70k £34.14k £90.62k
Total expenditure £36.22k £14.69k £28.81k £36.77k £40.11k
Income from government contracts £8.70k £8.47k £6.63k £8.28k £25.34k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.01k £14.89k