Trustees RISBOROUGH AREA COMMUNITY BUS
Charity number: 1136169

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROY PAGE | Chair | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Darrell Morgan | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Stevens | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD BARNARD | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN ARNOLD THOMAS | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHNSON | Trustee | 05 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GRAHAM HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.