IPSWICH METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING PASTORAL AND ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT TO CHURCHES WITHIN THE IPSWICH METHODIST CIRCUIT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

71 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 17 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
71 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Derek Grimshaw | Chair | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Michael William Stock | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Sharp | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNE CLARKE | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Timothy Mann | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Yelland | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Don Wellman | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Swift | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kath Calvesbert | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Montgomery Guest | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Deane Almond | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alberta Konadu-Yiadom | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Saul Tadzaushe | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mona Howes | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Giffard | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Joyce Andserson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Elizabeth Macartney | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Howes | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ian George Gardner | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Gooderham | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ratu Luke Rokobuli | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Scott | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martha Anna May Porter | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
HELEN FRANCES BARKER | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David John Sillett | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather June Farthing | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Alfred Vaughan | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Ann Stewart | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Gillanders | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marion Ellen Sillett | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Abbot | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Paterson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ruth O'Neill | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEAN PATRICIA JONES | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robin Pattinson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Hepplethwaite | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Rachel Steward | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Loggie | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Bowyer | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA WILKINS | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
VICKIE VALLOW | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
LIZ COPE | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
FREDDIE GUEST | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH Hepplethwaite | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Seabrook | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROGER THEOBALD | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA MCLEAN | Trustee | 31 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
MIKE WATSHAM | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
GERALD LAWS | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|||||
MIKE PECK | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROGER GAYFORD SMITH | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE WESTREN | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CALEY | Trustee | 21 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHARON CLARKSON | Trustee | 21 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS A DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
A S CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR RUSSELL LEEK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE DOROTHY FARQUHAR B SC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS V KEMP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Diana SAWYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Michael CASTLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr DAVID METTRICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Colin WESTREN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR CHRIS FINBOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jenny SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN ROBERTSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARILYN WATSHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN CHAMBERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD JOHN ANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mike BOWTELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS MAGGIE FINBOW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £326.55k | £328.28k | £559.24k | £354.51k | £366.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £374.98k | £380.16k | £397.42k | £388.20k | £415.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £4.96k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £553.97k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £397.42k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £858 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £344 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CIRCUIT OFFICE
17 BLACK HORSE LANE
IPSWICH
IP1 2EF
- Phone:
- 07591 341498
- Website:
-
methodistic.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window