WOODSEATS ADVICE CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer a free, impartial, confidential, high quality, advocacy, mediation and representation service to people living in Sheffield postal districts 8 and 17.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 03 March 2010: Standard registration
- 02 August 2012: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 02 August 2012: Funds transferred to 1146298 SHEAF CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £229.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £191.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 07 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 24 June 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF WOODSEATS IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND ADJOINING AREAS ("THE ARES OF BENEFIT") BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS
Area of benefit
CITY OF SHEFFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window