THE GLORY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
relieving people who are in need or hardship or who are aged or sick and ro relieve the distress caused thereby as the trustees may think fit from time to time
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 September 2010: Standard registration
- THE GLORY WORLDWIDE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONG KOO LEE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Karen Yu | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kyungim An | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
BYEONG KWON SON | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jung Suk Kim | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Soon Hee Ji | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chung Min Kim | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £2.00k | £5.00k | £3.00k | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £801 | £802 | £3.40k | £3.40k | £200 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2023 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 January 2021 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 27 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
I TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE LIVING IN LONDON WHO ARE POOR, AGED OR SICK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO POOR STUDENTS AND VISITS TO THE SICK AND ELDERLY; AND II TO MAKE SUCH GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO SUCH REGISTERED CHARITIES BASED IN LONDON AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
45
HOWARD ROAD
NEW MALDEN
LONDON
KT3 4EA
- Phone:
- 02089938339
- Email:
- JONGKOOLEE@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window