Accounts and annual returns LIVING HOPE MIRACLE MINISTRY

Charity number: 1135409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 20 December 2024 295 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 18 December 2023 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 25 July 2022 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 18 May 2021 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required