Financial history QUEENSBURY CELTIC FOOTBALL CLUB LIMITED

Charity Number: 1137671
Charity reporting is up to date (82 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £393.28k £105.57k £86.04k £94.16k £81.16k
Total expenditure £34.18k £57.18k £35.05k £94.44k £77.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A