CLARION FUTURES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are to develop the capacity and skills of the members of any socially and economically disadvantaged community so that they are better able to participate more fully in society; the prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship and to promote social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing people from becoming socially excluded.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£13,532,000
Donations and legacies | £3.88m | |
Charitable activities | £3.40m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £6.26m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£16,517,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £16.52m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £692,000 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £16.52m |
People

155 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
931 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 9 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 March 2010: Standard registration
- AFFINITY SUTTON COMMUNITY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- AFFINITY SUTTON FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Gavin Laurence Barwell | Chair | 26 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Richard Towes | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Niomi Gibson | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karima Fahmy | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
David John Ball | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.91m | £5.41m | £6.62m | £26.01m | £13.53m | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.40m | £13.68m | £15.99m | £15.80m | £16.52m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.26m | £1.94m | £1.67m | £1.30m | £692.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.93m | £2.16m | £2.16m | £13.51m | £3.88m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.08m | £2.69m | £4.07m | £2.97m | £3.40m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £900.00k | £556.00k | £401.00k | £9.49m | £6.26m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £38.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £16.40m | £13.66m | £15.98m | £15.80m | £16.52m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £679.00k | £928.00k | £1.11m | £1.09m | £1.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £836.00k | £960.00k | £991.00k | £734.00k | £707.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.00k | £21.00k | £9.00k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £36.81m | £27.01m | £18.00m | £30.56m | £25.78m | |
|
Other assets | £1.72m | £2.71m | £3.12m | £1.59m | £1.65m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £7.89m | £7.35m | £8.12m | £8.94m | £7.21m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 FEB 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15 JUN 2017 as amended on 21 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
(A) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF ANY SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY (B) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY (IN PARTICULAR): (1) PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. (2) PROVIDING INTERPRETING/TRANSLATING/ADVOCACY/ HEALTH/HOUSING ADVICE AND EDUCATION. (3) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. (4) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ENABLE PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE IN HEALTHY RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES THAT THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD (5) PROVIDING HOUSING ACCOMMODATION AND ASSISTANCE TO HELP HOUSE PEOPLE AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES AND AMENITIES FOR POOR PEOPLE (C) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY); DIGITAL EXCLUSION; SOCIAL HOUSING. (D1) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (1) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (3) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. (D2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE, "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS (E) THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (1) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP: (2) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT: (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE: (4) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES: (5) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS: (6) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING: (7) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES: (8) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE: (9) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; (10) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; (11) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; (12) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; (13) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION. (F) PROVIDING HOUSING ACCOMMODATION AND ASSISTANCE TO HELP HOUSE PEOPLE AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES AND AMENITIES FOR THE RELIEF OF AGED DISABLED OR HANDICAPPED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
5th Floor
Greater London House
Hampstead Road
London
- Phone:
- 07800 861595
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window