THE ASSAHABA CENTRE BRISTOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity works to promote racial harmony by increasing knowledge and mutual understanding for the general community by holding meetings with other communities and religious groups also trying to promote integration of the Arab community with other communities which will benefit all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 14 April 2010: Standard registration
- The Assahaba Mosque and Islamic Centre Bristol (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MABRUK MABRUK AZIZ | Chair |
|
|
|||||
YOUSEF HADROS ALTHEFEERI | Trustee | 16 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
BASSAM MOHAMMED SHAHIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAMEL SAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.84k | £17.04k | £27.88k | £42.55k | £42.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.51k | £58.73k | £26.47k | £33.25k | £42.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
A THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR WITHIN THE CITY OF BRISTOL BY I PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS II ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT GROUPS AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE OF ARAB ORIGIN OR HERITAGE III WORKING TOWARD ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE B THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR IN THE CITY OF BRISTOL BY I THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION II ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY III CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES, IN PARTICULAR INCLUDING THOSE OF ARAB HERITAGE, AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC C TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE DISADVANTAGED ARAB MUSLIM COMMUNITY IN THE CITY OF BRISTOL BY I ENABLING ARAB MUSLIMS INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS TO ADDRESS THEIR NEEDS AND ACHIEVE THEIR GOALS THROUGH LEARNING II ASSISTING ARAB MUSLIM INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS TO RAISE THE VOICE OF ARAB MUSLIM COMMUNITIES AND INFLUENCE DECISIONS THAT MATTER TO THEM III PROMOTING THEIR EMPLOYABILITY AND ENABLING THE ARAB MUSLIM INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS TO BE INVOLVED AND CONTRIBUTE TO IMPROVING SERVICES ACROSS THE WIDER COMMUNITIES D THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF THE HOLY QUR'AN AND SUNNAH E SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
CITY OF BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 COLNE GREEN
KEYNSHAM
BRISTOL
BS31 1UH
- Phone:
- 07802237529
- Email:
- Bassam@shahin.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window