Financial history THE VINJERU SCHOOL TRUST

Charity Number: 1135234
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £71.94k £88.83k £76.15k £95.31k £65.84k
Total expenditure £51.68k £82.40k £110.81k £87.25k £63.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A