Accounts and annual returns THE BATH AND DISTRICT DEPOSIT BOND SCHEME

Charity Number: 1135789
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 July 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 May 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 11 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 18 May 2015 On Time