MADINA ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) To operate the academy for the purpose of educating and training adults and young children, both male and female on Islamic, secular and other related subjects. 2) The advancement of Religious Education in accordance with the tenets of Ahle-Sunnah wal jamaat. 3) To promote other charitable works
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £189,249 from 15 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kirklees
Governance
- 04 May 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHABBIR KAZI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MUSA KAZI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.25k | £212.33k | £239.15k | £253.50k | £309.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.61k | £164.56k | £221.42k | £232.02k | £296.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £142.73k | £160.94k | £157.63k | £156.51k | £189.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 February 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 23 February 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
2.2 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ESTABLISH AND OPERATE THE ACADEMY FOR THE PURPOSE OF 'EDUCATING AND TRAINING ADULTS AND CHILDREN, BOTH MALE AND FEMALE ON ISLAMIC, SECULAR AND OTHER RELATED SUBJECTS. - 2.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF AHLE-SUNNAH WAL-JAMAAT. 2.4 TO FURTHER OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
SWINDON ROAD
DEWSBURY
WF13 2PA
- Phone:
- 01924731007
- Email:
- INFO@MADINAACADEMY.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window