Accounts and annual returns BACP RESEARCH FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1135440
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 19 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 15 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 15 December 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 05 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 05 December 2014 On Time