NORTH KENT METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The North Kent Methodist Circuit consists of 18 Methodist Churches, 1 Chinese Congregation and 5 joint Congregations of Methodists/ Anglican /Baptists or URC members. The Circuit covers the North Kent areas of Dartford, Gravesham, Maidstone, Medway, Sittingbourne and Sheerness. We have a Methodist membership of 942.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£589,225
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £23.33k | |
Other | £565.90k |
Total expenditure:
£693,459
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £693.46k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £693.46k |
People

16 Employee(s)
48 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 12 March 2010: Standard registration
- 04 June 2014: Funds received from 1135958 KENT THAMESIDE METHODIST CIRCUIT
- MAIDSTONE METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
48 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Alexander Kichenside | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|||||
James Michael Bryant | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev William Prince | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Lesley Bridges | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Anne Downs | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SIMON AFRICANUS ROWE | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN ANNE SKIPP | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROGER LYLE GLEDHILL | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES OLAVE SHEPHERD | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Dudley | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
KATHRYN ANNE HARDY | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
PAUL JOHN SKIPP | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE STELLA LEA | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
MING HANG HENRY CHUNG | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEREK GOODGER | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
RICHARD JOHN BRIDGES | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER GILBERT | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALAN DENNIS FIELDER | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY SHEILA ALLISON | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev NAOMI MARGARET OATES | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
ALAN RAINER | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev ROBERT ZACHAR | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY LOUISE BURCH | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Katherine High | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
GILLIAN MAY GRAY | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROGER STEPHEN BYARD | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev ROBIN JOHN SELMES | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK WILLIAM FROST | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS CHARE | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|||||
SYLVIA JEAN ANGEL | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Rev Dr BONNI BELLE PICKARD | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||
PETER ROGER MATTHEWS | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
BARRY LEONARD GEORGE ERRINGTON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN WALDOCK | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
TUNDE DIPITA-WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
GLENIS DAVISON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANET ANN ERRINGTON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
DEREK JARVIS | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hardy | Trustee | 03 January 2012 |
|
|||||
IAN SMITH | Trustee | 03 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEACON VICTOR NORMAN DOWNS | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA ANN SANDERSON | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL SMITH | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
IAN WILLIAM ANGEL | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANN ROBB | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JOHN BROWN | Trustee | 12 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALAN PAUL WOOD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £572.50k | £709.47k | £779.95k | £584.06k | £589.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £588.62k | £640.29k | £594.26k | £657.79k | £693.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.05k | £1.78k | £2.14k | £3.71k | £23.33k | |
|
Income - Other | £571.45k | £707.69k | £777.81k | £580.35k | £565.90k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £588.62k | £640.29k | £594.26k | £657.79k | £693.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.00k | £3.00k | £4.86k | £4.32k | £4.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £10.80k | £42.09k | £2.54k | £65.03k | £34.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.33m | £4.05m | £4.15m | £4.86m | £3.61m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £167.85k | £755.75k | £938.55k | £869.22k | £761.97k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £17.65k | £17.22k | £14.08k | £19.95k | £16.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 July 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 July 2022 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) AS AMENDED 17 MARCH 2011
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CIRCUIT OFFICE
UNION STREET METHODIST CHURCH
20 BREWER STREET
MAIDSTONE
KENT
ME14 1RU
- Phone:
- 07444335245
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window