BALSALL HEATH IS OUR PLANET LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BHIOP undertakes education and promotion of low energy, low carbon and low environmental impact living in Balsall Heath. and surrounding areas of Birmingham..
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 02 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD BEARD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
HYWEL WILLIAMS | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK WING | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.97k | £122 | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.32k | £6.51k | £4.40k | £1.03k | £195 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 February 2021 | 219 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 AUGUST 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 5 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROMOTING GOOD ENVIRONMENTAL PRACTICE AND AWARENESS OF RELATED ISSUES AMONGST THOSE WHO LIVE IN OR WORK IN BALSALL HEATH AND SURROUNDING AREAS B) INCREASING AWARENESS AMONGST THE COMMUNITY OF THE BENEFITS OF REDUCING CARBON DIOXIDE EMISSIONS AND OF EFFECTIVE WAYS TO MAKE SUCH REDUCTIONS
Area of benefit
BALSALL HEATH
Contact information
- Address:
-
JERICHO BUILDING
196-198 EDWARD ROAD
BALSALL HEATH
BIRMINGHAM
B12 9LX
- Phone:
- 0121 647 1960
- Email:
- BHIOP@JERICHO.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window