JEHOVA JIREH PARISH LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of Christian religion, education and training, provision of material and spiritual assistance, and relief of poverty, sickness and distress in accordance with the tenets of the Celestial Church of Christ. Principal area of operation in the UK is the London Borough of Croydon but we do provide support to churches overseas, particularly in Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
Governance
- 02 September 2010: Standard registration
- CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST (Previous name)
- PAROISSE JEHOVAH JIREH LTD (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HORTENSE ELOUNDOU | Trustee | 23 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
KOFFI ATSU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RITA ABRA KAFUI AGBEDIGUE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWIGE SENA AUDE EDWIGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSE INES APEFA YAWA AMEGA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.37k | £3.39k | £1.23k | £2.04k | £1.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.72k | £3.51k | £1.33k | £1.90k | £1.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/07/2010
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF THE CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST. WORSHIP GOD THROUGH JESUS. PH12:9-11 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; ASSISTANCE MATERIAL AND SPIRITUAL TO THOSE IN NEED. 2CH14:10 3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS. MATT25:35-36
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Wingate Crescent
East Croydon
Croydon
CR0 3AL
- Phone:
- 02084091948
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window