GRACE CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity Number: 1134634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grace Christian Trust was formed in 2010. In its first year, the trust purchased a large office building on an extensive site with the purpose of donating it to a local church who intend to build a new centre to serve the town. This site will be donated to the church if and when they are granted appropriate planning permission by Tandridge District Council.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 28 February 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 March 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR I MAYO Trustee
THE OAKS CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time
OAKHALL CHURCH, CATERHAM
Received: On time
MR A MAYO Trustee
STEWARDS COMPANY LTD
Received: On time
MRS J MAYO Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 20/02/2023 28/02/2024
Total gross income £3.37k £135.13k £210.54k £623.21k £520.01k
Total expenditure £4.04k £130.02k £56.79k £63.10k £35.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £600.00k £480.00k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £25.99k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £23.21k £14.01k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £57.43k £29.61k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £5.67k £5.88k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £2.46k £2.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £43.13k £1.85k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £5.67k £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 20/02/2023 28/02/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A £596.29k £1.16m
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A £638.61k £658.79k
Other assets N/A N/A N/A £202.81k £116.15k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A £4.02k £3.17k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2024 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2024 10 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 February 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 February 2023 19 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 25 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 25 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 09 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 29 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
OTFORD MANOR
SHOREHILL LANE
KNATTS VALLEY
SEVENOAKS
TN15 6XF
Phone:
07377354119
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available