Financial history CHUDLEIGH KNIGHTON PRE SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1135623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £68.74k £72.48k £94.43k £72.97k £104.30k
Total expenditure £72.21k £79.98k £84.32k £77.58k £98.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A