HASTINGS BEXHILL & RYE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Faith through worship; teaching in small groups; encouraging pastoral work amongst the sick, bereaved and others with particular needs; and supporting UK and overseas charities through finance and prayer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

43 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
Governance
- 10 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
43 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philip Paul Wagstaff | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Crawford James Logan | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jane Harrington | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julie Todd | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Jonathan Todd | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Wise | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Simon Irving | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Catharine Lapping | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frances Parnham | Trustee | 29 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Frederick Knight | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Graham Hatch | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Diane Martin | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA JEAN SINDEN | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR GEOF CORKE | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Arthur Grainger Hobson | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAULA FOORD | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BURSON | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
David John Swales | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Heather Margaret White | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Adela Mary Binns | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Troughton | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MARK TROUGHTON | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
RODNEY ROY SINDEN | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE BARBARA PEARSON | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JAMES HAMPSON | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN ELIZABETH PULLEN | Trustee | 11 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR MIKE LAMBOURNE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET BICKERDIKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL HELEN SAYERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA IRENE PEPPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL EDGAR MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEATHER CHRISTINA BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY ELIZABETH HATCH | Trustee |
|
||||||
TERENCE STEPHEN NOVIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
KEITH BARRY MILLER | Trustee |
|
||||||
BARRY PAUL TURNWELL ACIB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANE ELIZABETH FUNNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH RICHARD THACKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN IRENE LAMBOURNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ROY FUNNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ANN THACKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ROGER HANSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAWN ANDREA NOVIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205.99k | £182.37k | £565.52k | £667.01k | £132.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £400.69k | £213.49k | £810.85k | £246.79k | £193.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £159.16k | £3.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £15.59k | £16.35k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £390.78k | £647.66k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £810.85k | £53.75k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £750 | £750 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £30.60k | £53.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £193.04k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Holliers Hill
Bexhill-on-Sea
TN40 2DH
- Phone:
- 01424 550427
- Email:
- office@hbrmethodists.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window