AL-FALAH TRUST UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates in the union council of THATHI GUJAR KHAN PAKISTAN Providing social welfare and education by supporting bonefide local organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Pakistan
Governance
- 20 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED HANIF | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mohammed Farid | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bilal Seerat | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Habib | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Iftikhar-ur Rehman | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Zahoor | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Qasim Hanif | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Sadeeq | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Umar Aslam | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Naseem | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sohail Murtaza | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shahzad Nabi | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mazhar Hussain | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Mujeeb | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Ghafoor | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
KHALID HANIF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.37k | £30.26k | £34.77k | £34.91k | £33.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.10k | £10.77k | £5.60k | £32.74k | £6.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 September 2024 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 September 2024 | 218 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN THATHI, PAKISTAN, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT. (2) TO RELIEVE ELDERLY PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THATHI, PAKISTAN, WHO ARE IN NEED, BY PROVIDING HOUSING AND ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS. (3) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST ELDERLY PEOPLE AND VULNERABLE GROUPS.
Area of benefit
THATHI, PAKISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
105 OAKWOOD ROAD
SPARKHILL
BIRMINGHAM
B11 4EY
- Phone:
- 07561531326
- Email:
- ALFALAHUKTRUST@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window