TALITHA KOUM COMMUNITY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charitable company operates a supported housing centre and separate groups within the community to help women who want support as they move on from trauma and turmoil. Life events may include addiction, family breakdown, neglect, abuse and disempowerment. Professional staff help women to address individual needs, explore life goals and find the self-confidence to move on.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 15 April 2010: Standard registration
- 07 August 2012: Funds received from 1117077 RELEASE IPSWICH
- RELEASE IPSWICH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Graeme Harper | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JANE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Janet Cross | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Louise Jane Ramsay | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gary Julian Baker | Trustee | 24 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.00k | £201.14k | £264.06k | £151.21k | £191.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.65k | £124.37k | £138.08k | £141.18k | £192.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 SEP 2021
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE CARE AND REHABILITATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE EXPERIENCING SUBSTANCE DEPENDENCY OR MISUSE AND ADDICTIVE BEHAVIOUR IN THE IPSWICH AREA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT INCLUDING THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF ANY REHABILITATION RESIDENTIAL CENTRE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE AREA OF SUBSTANCE DEPENDENCY BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING BY RAISING THE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC OF THE ISSUES RELATED TO SUBSTANCE DEPENDENCY AND MISUSE AND ADDICTIVE BEHAVIOUR IN IPSWICH AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF THE ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY
Area of benefit
THE IPSWICH AREA, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Hope Centre
Witnesham
IPSWICH
IP6 9JE
- Phone:
- 01473857432
- Email:
- info@talithakoum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window