GRASSINGTON HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF GRASSINGTON AND ITS SURROUNDING COMMUNITIES AND VISITORS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME.THE COMPANY WILL PROVIDE A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £16,803 from 2 government contract(s) and £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 15 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Christine Vetch | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Philip Grady | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Neil Todd | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey Judith Earl | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Slater | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Headley | Trustee | 30 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.20k | £88.47k | £59.54k | £85.29k | £64.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.49k | £48.54k | £48.70k | £64.41k | £60.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.50k | £38.08k | £25.60k | £25.73k | £16.80k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £17.30k | £8.20k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 02 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF GRASSINGTON AND ITS SURROUNDING COMMUNITIES AND VISITORS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, RACE, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION BY ASSOCIATING THE SAID RESIDENTS AND VISITORS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS AND VISITORS IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE COMPANY WILL HAVE THE POWER TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND MAINTAIN, MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES UNDERTAKEN OR PROMOTED BY THE COMPANY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
GRASSINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor Hill Barn
Garrs Lane
Grassington
BD23 5AT
- Phone:
- 01756752222
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window