EAST BERKSHIRE EXECUTIVE JOB CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's prime objectives are: To assist all members of the Charity to exploit and develop their skills for appropriate employment. To provide a place where advice and peer support for its members on future employment. To provide relevant training for employment and in coping with the impact of unemployment, including CV writing, networking, interview coaching techniques.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Slough
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 04 June 2010: Standard registration
- 23 May 2024: Funds received from 1134569 BRACKNELL EXECUTIVE JOB CLUB LIMITED
- WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD EXECUTIVE JOB CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rajesh Patel | Chair | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Stokes | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hartwell | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kay Senior | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|||||
KEVIN McLOUGHLIN | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Wheeler | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.86k | £1.10k | £381 | £250 | £11.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08k | £445 | £2.14k | £524 | £3.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/05/2010 AS AMENDED ON 17/07/2014 AS AMENDED ON 25/06/2015
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Copse Edge
Dodds Lane
CHALFONT ST. GILES
Buckinghamshire
HP8 4EL
- Phone:
- 07761747739
- Email:
- csjobclub@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window