Accounts and annual returns THE FRED DIBNAH HERITAGE CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1141313
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 December 2017 03 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 December 2016 09 October 2017 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 05 December 2015 12 December 2016 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 05 December 2014 29 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 December 2014 Not Required