Financial history THE FRED DIBNAH HERITAGE CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1141313
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/12/2013 05/12/2014 05/12/2015 05/12/2016 05/12/2017
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0