THE FRED DIBNAH HERITAGE CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1141313
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

preservation refurbishment and improvement of the home of celebrity steeplejack Dr Fred Dibnah MBE which is now open to the public as the Fred Dibnah Heritage centre. Charity now wound up

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 December 2017

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £1,479

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 April 2011: Standard registration
  • 11 October 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/12/2013 05/12/2014 05/12/2015 05/12/2016 05/12/2017
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 December 2017 03 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 December 2016 09 October 2017 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 05 December 2015 12 December 2016 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 05 December 2014 29 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 December 2014 Not Required