TILEHOUSE STREET BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church engages in a range of activities for the purpose of the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist demonination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdon and/or other parts of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 23 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Stears-Handscomb | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Moody | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Chamberlain | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Christopher Patrick Maguire | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Bleasby | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev JANE ROBSON | Trustee | 26 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA HALLAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS MEG GRANGER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.32k | £96.30k | £99.89k | £121.98k | £120.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.97k | £101.68k | £111.57k | £104.49k | £105.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 NOVEMBER 2009 as amended on 18 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
UPPER TILEHOUSE STREET
HITCHIN
HERTS
SG5 2EE
- Phone:
- 01462456765
- Email:
- info@ths-baptist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window