Trustees WEST HERTFORDSHIRE AND BORDERS METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1135094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

45 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev RACHAEL LOUISE HAWKINS Chair 26 September 2012
ANGLICAN METHODIST ASSOCIATION (BERKHAMSTED) LIMITED
Received: On time
ALL SAINTS' CHURCH, BERKHAMSTED
Received: On time
HARPENDEN METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
BEDFORDSHIRE ESSEX AND HERTFORDSHIRE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Trevor Anthony Wadcock Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Miranda Henrietta Kowalczyk Trustee 01 May 2024
None on record
LINDA CATHERINA MORGAN Trustee 01 May 2024
ALL SAINTS' CHURCH, BERKHAMSTED
Received: On time
THE WAY INN CHRISTIAN CENTRE TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Helen Louise Roberts Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Esther Mary Wane Trustee 01 September 2023
HARPENDEN METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Lesley Markham-Jones Trustee 16 August 2023
None on record
Rev Joyce Mayisiri Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
KATHRYN MARGARET SPALL Trustee 18 January 2022
ALL SAINTS' CHURCH, BERKHAMSTED
Received: On time
Michael Hill Trustee 08 November 2021
ST THOMAS' UNITED REFORMED CHURCH WATFORD CHARITY
Received: On time
Shireen Wickham Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Rev Caroline Ann Weaver Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Michael Lees Trustee 22 April 2021
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Ann Matthews Trustee 09 December 2020
None on record
Ann Iris Shepherd Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
Deacon Sarah Wickett Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Rev Donna Lynne Fowler-Marchant Trustee 01 September 2020
ST THOMAS' UNITED REFORMED CHURCH WATFORD CHARITY
Received: On time
Rosemary Anne Rhodes Trustee 01 February 2020
None on record
Rev Andrew John Brazier Trustee 01 September 2019
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Margaret Rose Woods Trustee 30 August 2019
HARPENDEN METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time