THE WM MORRISON DARLINGTON ENTERPRISE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the relief of poverty among all members of the community but in particular members who are unemployed or at risk of being unemployed or those less able than others to care for themselves. Current activities include job-search and employability support and skills development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
Governance
- 23 March 2010: Standard registration
- 23 November 2011: Funds received from 327040 THE WM MORRISON DARLINGTON ENTERPRISE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRUCE CHARLES WARNES | Chair | 22 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Mike Renton | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER WILKINSON | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Skitt | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Miller | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Campbell Watson | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £570.77k | £401.80k | £475.82k | £417.58k | £457.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £574.14k | £415.26k | £400.24k | £477.24k | £409.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £61.93k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £70.57k | £60.90k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £570.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £229 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £574.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/03/2010
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG ALL MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY BUT IN PARTICULAR MEMBERS WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED OR AT RISK OF BEING UNEMPLOYED OR THOSE LESS ABLE THAN OTHERS TO CARE FOR THEMSELVES. (2) THE GENERAL ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR (THOUGH WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING WORDS) THE FOSTERING AND PROMOTION OF TEACHING AND TRAINING IN THE SKILLS OF BUSINESS MANAGEMENT PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO SMALL BUSINESSES AMONG PERSONS WHOSE ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WOULD BE ALLEVIATED OR IMPROVED BY THE ACQUISITION OF SUCH SKILLS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Morton Park Business Training Centr
Morton Park Way
DARLINGTON
DL1 4PJ
- Phone:
- 01325387700
- Email:
- info@morrisontrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window