Financial history EXETER VISUAL ART

Charity number: 1137334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £47.95k £41.32k £41.48k £46.66k £46.32k
Total expenditure £41.00k £42.01k £42.64k £47.35k £50.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A