HEPHZIBAH CHURCH CARDIFF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The mission of Hephzibah Church Cardiff is to glorify God and extend His kingdom by living and proclaiming His truth in the world. Our Purpose: To study God's Word with precision, To speak God's message with power, To serve God's purpose with zeal, To shepherd God's flock with care, and To fight the good fight with courage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
- City Of London
- Philippines
Governance
- 27 April 2010: Standard registration
- CARDIFF CITY CHURCH (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR SECK KUAN YEE | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|||||
SHU WING LEE | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARIETTA Clavo | Trustee | 25 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.22k | £15.08k | £16.30k | £16.52k | £21.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.64k | £17.18k | £15.89k | £10.98k | £19.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2024 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 April 2021 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 FEBRUARY 2010 AS AMENDED ON 17/03/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH/RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 FLAXLAND AVENUE
CARDIFF
CF14 3NT
- Phone:
- 07455221600
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window